THE FRIENDS OF THE OR HACHAIM EDUCATIONAL CENTRE FOR GIRLS
Charity number: 328648
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2005
Total income: £92,320
Total expenditure: £93,081
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Israel
Governance
Registration history:
- 24 May 1990: Standard registration
- 16 February 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2004 | 31/05/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.81k | £92.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £129.65k | £93.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2009 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11 MAY 1990
Charitable objects
FURTHERANCE OF THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE OR HACHAIM EDUCATIONAL CENTRE FOR GIRLS IN ISRAEL.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
ISRAEL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window