FRANCIS HOUSE FAMILY TRUST

Charity number: 328659
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Francis House Family Trust exists to manage & fund Francis House & Francis Lodge Children & Young Peoples Hospice. Providing respite & end of life care for children & young people with life limiting conditions, and the necessary support and short term care for their families. Care is available to families regardless of cultural or religious backgrounds. Care is family and child /young person led.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 July 1990: Standard registration
  • 08 February 2023: Funds received from 1151518 THE JOSHUA WILSON BRAIN TUMOUR CHARITY
  • 13 February 2023: Funds received from 1029562 ROTARY CLUB OF SALFORD WITH SWINTON CHARITABLE TRU...
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • FRANCIS HOUSE (Working name)
  • RAINBOW FAMILY TRUST (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane Amanda Kempler Chair 05 October 2023
None on record
Rev Stephen Woolley Trustee 16 January 2025
None on record
Eamonn Sean O'Neal Trustee 11 May 2023
THE GREATER MANCHESTER HIGH SHERIFF'S POLICE TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Edward Robert Gasiorowski Trustee 15 April 2021
None on record
Rev Joseph Carney Trustee 15 April 2021
None on record
Aysha Rangrez Trustee 14 January 2021
None on record
Dr Andrew Taylor Trustee 11 January 2018
None on record
VIJAY ANDREW KUMAR SRIVASTAVA LLB Trustee 02 July 2015
None on record
CHARLES LEDIGO Trustee 16 April 2015
None on record
Judith Amosi-Khodadad Trustee 24 January 2013
THE SHAARE HAYIM CONGREGATION
Received: On time
DR SUSAN MARY O'HALLORAN Trustee 26 January 2012
None on record
DR SUSAN KIRK Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.45m £4.45m £4.19m £5.29m £5.51m
Total expenditure £5.33m £4.99m £5.11m £5.99m £7.05m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £737.67k £876.71k £922.30k £866.23k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.22m £2.62m £2.27m £3.28m £2.99m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £580.08k £0 £0 £791.47k
Income - Charitable activities £657.09k £716.89k £737.92k £702.14k £1.20m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £793.46k £532.92k £584.72k £572.74k £529.26k
Income - Other £783.33k £0 £595.08k £766.73k £0
Income - Legacies £1.04m £632.40k £925.63k £1.99m £1.75m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.74m £4.58m £4.72m £5.50m £6.62m
Expenditure - Raising funds £550.32k £364.80k £344.27k £423.38k £358.31k
Expenditure - Governance £163.21k £148.74k £153.73k £182.17k £227.06k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £89.59k £112.12k £119.41k £103.44k £91.79k
Expenditure - Other £44.00k £46.47k £47.68k £70.34k £67.32k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £6.35m £7.00m £7.18m £7.74m £7.45m
Long-term investments £17.14m £22.98m £22.68m £18.68m £19.16m
Other assets £913.66k £899.85k £796.69k £1.11m £593.07k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £319.10k £271.55k £314.45k £300.64k £338.24k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 13 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 13 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Francis House Family Trust
390 Parrs Wood Road
East Didsbury
Manchester
M20 5NA
Phone:
01614344118