Financial history THE BACTA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 328668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £167.68k £17.08k £15.52k £84.05k £115.05k
Total expenditure £139.23k £51.31k £11.10k £55.07k £79.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A