THE BACTA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust is established to help people in the United Kingdom in need, hardship or distress as a result of local, national or international disaster or by their social and economic circumstances. At their discretion, the trustees can make grants for any other charitable purposes for the general benefit of the inhabitants of the United Kingdom.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 13 June 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Miller | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nick Harding | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN ROBERT HAWKINS | Trustee | 24 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Paul Lauder | Trustee | 27 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARK NICHOLAS HORWOOD | Trustee | 27 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN STERGIDES | Trustee | 27 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £167.68k | £17.08k | £15.52k | £84.05k | £115.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £139.23k | £51.31k | £11.10k | £55.07k | £79.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2023
(These accounts |
29 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16/05/1990 AS AMENDED ON 30/05/1991 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 13/10/1994 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 20/09/2012 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 16/10/2014 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 06 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED ON 23 NOV 2017 as amended on 26 Nov 2019 as amended on 26 Nov 2020 as amended on 25 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS, WHETHER OR NOT THEY ARE RESIDENT OR TEMPORARILY LOCATED IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AS A RESULT OF LOCAL, NATIONAL OR INTERNATIONAL DISASTER OR BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES AND ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
B A C T A
30 Ely Place
LONDON
EC1N 6TD
- Phone:
- 07966787307
- Email:
- info@bacta.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window