KHATME NUBUWWAT CENTRE

Charity number: 328715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

EDUCATION, WELFARE, & TRAINING

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £55,964
Total expenditure: £70,903

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Lambeth

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 July 1990: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • AALAMI MAJLISE TAHAFFUZE KHATME NUBUWWAT (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SAAD MAHMOOD QURESHI Trustee 03 May 2024
None on record
Umar Mahmood Qureshi Trustee 04 November 2022
None on record
Mohammed Aslam Trustee 23 August 2016
None on record
TOAHA QURESHI Trustee
NUST TRUST FOUNDATION UK
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £42.53k £31.97k £19.07k £52.60k £55.96k
Total expenditure £47.65k £33.37k £12.73k £46.53k £70.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 24 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 09 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 09 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 18 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 19 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FIRD Secreteriate
43-45 Coldharbour Lane
Suit 2
Camberwell
LONDON
SE5 9NR
Phone:
07939021060
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available