Financial history THE MUSEUM OF EAST ASIAN ART

Charity number: 328725
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £331.80k £339.61k £410.39k £395.06k £416.47k
Total expenditure £390.79k £299.85k £360.86k £382.02k £402.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £912 £59.53k £18.92k £1.06k £1.09k