Trustees THE MUSEUM OF EAST ASIAN ART
Charity number: 328725

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNE Elizabeth SHEPHERD | Chair | 10 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Sarah Neilson Main | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANNE HSIU-CHI PERNG | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Theresa Frances Munford | Trustee | 17 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Elspeth Scott | Trustee | 17 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Duncan Balmer | Trustee | 28 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Nigel Clifton Griffiths | Trustee | 02 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Christine Mary Gore | Trustee | 14 December 2005 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.