ASYLUM AID
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of legal advice and representation to people seeking asylum in the UK, lobbying and campaigning with the aim of achieving a fairer asylum process in the UK and advancing public and understanding of the position of asylum seekers and refugees in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,723,495
Donations and legacies | £708.77k | |
Charitable activities | £975.78k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £38.94k |
Total expenditure:
£1,203,361
Raising funds | £46.55k | |
Charitable activities | £1.16m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £208,307 from 2 government contract(s) and £64,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £46.55k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.16m | |
Retained for future use | £520.13k |
People

24 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 July 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yehia Nasr | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Ruth Tanner | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Lorenz | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Mottershaw | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sir Nicolas Bratza | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Scampion | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Constantine Partasides | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £236.03k | £707.51k | £883.37k | £1.72m | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £168.12k | £480.33k | £640.50k | £1.20m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £61.31k | £190.46k | £208.31k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £64.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £390.40k | £640.59k | £708.77k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £317.11k | £242.78k | £975.78k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £38.94k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £15.10k | £47.27k | £5.52k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £458.47k | £614.64k | £1.16m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £21.86k | £25.86k | £46.55k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £19.70k | £20.39k | £153.28k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | £933 | £2.62k | £13.18k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | £494.16k | £842.45k | £1.53m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | £200.01k | £307.12k | £481.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 17 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/06/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/02/2005 as amended on 20 May 2022 as amended on 15 Sep 2022 as amended on 15 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
2. Objects 2.1 The Charity is established for the following purposes for the benefit of the Beneficiaries: 2.1.1 to relieve their conditions of need, hardship or distress (including by providing them with legal advice and representation); 2.1.2 to preserve and protect their physical and mental health; 2.1.3 to advance their education and training so as to advance them in life and assist them to adapt within a new community; 2.1.4 to advance public education about the position of and issues relating to the Beneficiaries, including the situations which give rise to refugee movements; and 2.1.5 assisting them in such other exclusively charitable ways as the Charity determines from time to time. 2.2 In this Article 2, “Beneficiaries” means individuals who: 2.2.1 are seeking asylum or other forms of protection in the UK; 2.2.2 have already been granted refugee status, humanitarian protection or other forms of protection status by UK immigration authorities; 2.2.3 have insecure immigration status or are stateless; 2.2.4 are vulnerable to destitution, exploitation, abuse, trafficking or other forms of human cruelty including but not limited to those outside their country of origin; and 2.2.5 the dependants of those mentioned in Articles 2.2.1 to 2.2.4 above.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Asylum Aid
26 Westland Place
LONDON
N1 7JH
- Phone:
- 02073549631
- Email:
- advice@asylumaid.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window