Financial history ADAR CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 328731
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £120.57k £80.80k £197.32k £231.07k £198.03k
Total expenditure £28.30k £24.27k £180.00k £197.57k £175.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A