Accounts and annual returns THE KINGDOM TRUST

Charity Number: 328733
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2008 18 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2008 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2007 14 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2007 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2006 29 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2006 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2005 10 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2005 10 November 2005 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2004 10 December 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2004 Not Required