Financial history THE KINGDOM TRUST

Charity number: 328733
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2004 05/04/2005 05/04/2006 05/04/2007 05/04/2008
Total gross income £6.94k £8.77k £2.03k £0 £0
Total expenditure £5.80k £11.25k £1.90k £179 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A