THE KINGDOM TRUST

Charity Number: 328733
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Donations to charities with aims supported by the Kingdom Trust

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2008

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 July 1990: Standard registration
  • 03 June 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2004 05/04/2005 05/04/2006 05/04/2007 05/04/2008
Total gross income £6.94k £8.77k £2.03k £0 £0
Total expenditure £5.80k £11.25k £1.90k £179 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2008 18 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2008 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2007 14 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2007 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2006 29 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2006 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2005 10 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2005 10 November 2005 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2004 10 December 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2004 Not Required