THE CIA CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 26 July 1990: Standard registration
- 25 July 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2011 | 30/06/2012 | 30/06/2013 | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £234.30k | £218.52k | £182.28k | £43.96k | £2.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £294.01k | £171.49k | £216.24k | £101.93k | £18.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | 03 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2014 | 04 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2014 | 04 December 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2013 | 03 April 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2013 | 03 April 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 9 NOVEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE CHEMICAL & ALLIED INDUSTRIES & FOR THAT PURPOSE TO PROMOTE IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY THINK FIT THE EXPANSION OF RELEVANT KNOWLEDGE & INFORMATION AVIALABLE TO EMPLOYEES IN THE SAID INDUSTRIES & TO TEACHERS, LECTURERS AND STUDENTS ABOUT THE SAID INDUSTRIES & ABOUT RELATED ASPECTS OF THE ECONOMIC & SOCIAL BACKGROUND TO THE CHEMICAL & ALLIED INDUSTRIES TO PROMOTE RESEARCH IN HEALTH & ENVIRONMENTAL MATTERS CONNECTED WITH THE CHEMICAL & ALLIED INDUSTRIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC & IN PARTICULAR THOSE EMPLOYED IN THE INDUSTRIES & TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH & TO PROVIDE OR SUBSCRIBE & CONTRIBUTE TO THE PROVISION OR MAINTENANCE OF ALL FACILITIES OF WHATSOEVER NATURE IN CONNECTION THERWITH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window