Register of Charities - The Charity Commission ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST GENERAL FUND
Charity number: 1053793-39
Linked charity
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11/10/1996
AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 02/11/2000
AS AMENDED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT DATED 13/03/2005
AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 29/03/2010 as amended on 06 Mar 2018 as amended on 17 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE WHOLLY OR MAINLY WITHIN THE ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 29 November 1996: Standard registration
Other names
- BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON MENTAL HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE PARTNERSHIP NHS TRUST GENERAL FUND (Previous name)
- BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON COMMUNITY NHS TRUST GENERAL FUND (Previous name)
- SOUTH BEDFORDSHIRE COMMUNITY HEALTH TRUST GENERAL (Previous name)
- SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST GENERAL FUND (Previous name)
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.