Charity overview HENRICUS OCTAVIUS ROE IN CONNECTION WITH FAIRFIELD HOSPITAL, ARLESEY
Charity Number: 1053793-49
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 28/08/1951
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 28/10/1977
AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 29/03/2010
Charitable objects
IN THE SUPPLY OF MONEY OR ARTICLES IN KIND FOR THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF DESERVING AND NECESSITOUS PERSONS WHO HAVE BEEN PATIENTS IN THE FAIRFIELD HOSPITAL, ON THEIR DISCHARGE THERE-FROM, OR IN THE SUPPLY OF MONEY OR ARTICLES IN KIND FOR THE AID AND ASSISTANCE OF DESERVING AND NECESSITOUS PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN EMPLOYED IN ANY CAPACITY AT THE SAID HOSPITAL AND WHO THROUGH AGE, ILLNESS, INFIRMITY OR ACCIDENT HAVE BECOME INCAPACITATED FROM CONTINUING THEIR SERVICES, OR THE WIVES, WIDOWS OR FAMILIES OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 30 January 1997: Standard registration
- 27 July 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
- HENRIOUS OCTAVIUS ROE IN CONNECTION WITH FAIRFIELD HOSPITAL, ARLESEY (Previous name)
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.