Register of Charities - The Charity Commission DISTRICT NURSES FUND

Charity number: 1053793-2
Linked charity
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19/08/1996 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 18/12/2002, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 1ST AUGUST 2006 AND 31 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF PATIENTS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN TREATED BY THE SOUTH EAST ESSEX PRIMARY CARE TRUST AND BY PROMOTING THE EFFICIENT PERFORMANCE OF THEIR DUTIES BY THE DISTRICT NURSES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 30 September 1996: Standard registration
Other names

No other names