Financial history ONE TO ONE (ENFIELD)

Charity number: 1061507
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £255.44k £227.85k £190.19k £222.23k £262.56k
Total expenditure £255.24k £198.21k £175.98k £266.41k £274.41k
Income from government contracts £35.00k £35.00k N/A N/A £32.00k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £35.00k £71.25k £160.85k