THE PRIMROSE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist in the provision of a specialist Brest Care Unit in Plymouth
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cornwall
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 09 September 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Osmaston | Chair | 28 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katarzyna Dickson | Trustee | 30 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Theresa Williams | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Nick Davis | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kayleigh Davenport | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Julie Wheeler | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Peter Franklin | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
John Dickson | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.33k | £34.94k | £43.49k | £90.61k | £118.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.67k | £39.58k | £54.50k | £101.47k | £86.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 November 2024 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 AUGUST 1997 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 28 SEP 2017 as amended on 23 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS (?THE OBJECTS?): 2.1 TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT LIFE OF PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, BY SUPPORTING THE CONTINUED PROVISION AND ENHANCEMENT OF SERVICE BY THE BREAST CARE CENTRE (KNOWN AS THE THE PRIMROSE CENTRE) AT DERRIFORD HOSPITAL, PLYMOUTH (?THE CENTRE?) 2.2 TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM BREAST DISEASES INCLUDING CANCER BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES, AND SUPPORT SERVICES. 2.3 TO PROMOTE BETTER HEALTH BY THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Primrose Foundation
Derriford Hospital
Derriford Road
Derriford
PLYMOUTH
PL6 8DH
- Phone:
- 01752975217
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window