KEIGHLEY VOLUNTARY SERVICE LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
KVS, working under the trading name of Keighley & Ilkley Voluntary and Community Action (KIVCA), works at the heart of many local communities, stimulating and supporting local action and co-ordinating new initiatives. KVS is active in the district and beyond, building bridges and promoting the needs and voice of voluntary and community groups in the Keighley Constituency to a wider world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bradford City
Governance
- 02 April 1997: Standard registration
- 10 March 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 10 March 2020: Funds transferred to 1090036 COMMUNITY ACTION BRADFORD & DISTRICT LTD.
- KEIGHLEY & ILKLEY VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY ACTION (Working name)
- KVS (Working name)
- KEIGHLEY COUNCIL OF VOLUNTARY SERVICE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £880.15k | £752.47k | £566.01k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £947.02k | £765.33k | £541.75k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £415.43k | £295.77k | £213.11k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £51.53k | £95.59k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £363.56k | £353.87k | £295.54k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £516.24k | £398.32k | £270.29k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £361 | £281 | £177 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £12.34k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £940.10k | £765.20k | £540.82k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £138 | £925 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.86k | £9.59k | £17.60k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 28 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 22 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 09 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2017
(These accounts |
09 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 06 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 10 January 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 NOVEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24 MARCH 1997 NOW ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 28 JANUARY 2010 REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 15 FEBRUARY 2010.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES THAT IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LOCAL PEOPLE'S LIVES THROUGH VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY ACTION, PARTICULARLY THROUGH EDUCATION, HEALTH PROMOTION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window