MOGGERHANGER HOUSE PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve for the people of Bedfordshire and the Nation at large the building known as Moggerhanger House and the land appurtenant thereto.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bedford
Governance
- 17 October 1997: Standard registration
- MHPT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Parry | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kim Pearson | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW BOYD STUPPLE | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.42k | £1.10m | £257.94k | £150.47k | £207.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £248.39k | £234.79k | £385.14k | £262.05k | £389.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £75.31k | £169.04k | £13.67k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £1.06m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £2.25k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £35.42k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £122.30k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £4.85k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £112.49k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 February 2023 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 March 2023 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 SEPTEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED 31.3.98
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE TOWNSPEOPLE OF BOROUGH OF BEDFORD IN THE COUNTY OF BEDFORDSHIRE AND OF THE NATION AT LARGE, THE BUILDING KNOWN AS MOGGERHANGER HOUSE, THE PARK, MOGGERHANGER, BEDFORD AND THE LAND APPURTENANT THERETO AND TO USE THE SAME FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MOGGERHANGER PARK LTD
THE PARK
PARK ROAD
MOGGERHANGER
BEDFORD
MK44 3RW
- Phone:
- 07703395689
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window