Financial history WEETON HONEYPOT UNDER 5'S CENTRE

Charity Number: 1061700
Charity reporting is overdue by 321 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £100.76k £100.14k £103.32k £96.85k £82.18k
Total expenditure £97.81k £94.20k £93.96k £84.19k £68.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A