THE STONE CHURCH MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity apart from education & training of members to live an exemplary life reflecting the life of our saviour & Lord Jesus Christ. We seek to aleviate suffering not only of members but needy residents in the wider community by participating in the Premier Radio Initiative. We also support giving out financial aid to countries facing hardships as a result of natural disasters.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lewisham
- Germany
- Liberia
- Nigeria
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 21 November 1997: Standard registration
- WORD ALIVE MINISTRIES (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PASTOR ALEX ADEGBOYE | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Rev Victor Amosun | Trustee | 17 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||
PASTOR YOMI OLOWOYO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
WALE ADELAJA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Ephraim Olumewo Pastor | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.95k | £23.66k | £22.14k | £24.97k | £37.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.80k | £22.03k | £18.36k | £21.70k | £32.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 May 2024 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19TH NOVEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
THE ORGANISATION IS ESTABLISHED TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND GOSPEL IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE IN PARTICULAR BY MAKING GRANTS OR DONATIONS TO SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS WHICH ARE ADVANCING AND RELIEVING POVERTY.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 FLEMING WAY
LONDON
SE28 8NR
- Phone:
- 07944563385
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window