Financial history MARYLAND STUDIOS

Charity Number: 1063391
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £23.82k £30.59k £30.85k £30.30k £31.80k
Total expenditure £23.60k £27.55k £35.97k £31.58k £31.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A