VILLA REAL SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1062793
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fundraising arm for Villa Real School a purpose built mixed day special school for children & young people aged 2-19 years with severe, complex, profound and multiple learning difficulties and autism. Many of them have associated physical and sensory difficulties and challenging behaviours.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £7,368
Total expenditure: £27,151

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Durham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 June 1997: Standard registration
  • 03 September 2020: Funds received from 1165830 FAMILIES AND CONDUCTIVE EDUCATION
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • VRSA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Deborah Simpson Chair 17 October 2019
None on record
Deborah Smith Trustee 18 October 2019
None on record
Jill Bowe Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
JEAN ALLEN Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £8.80k £7.55k £10.43k £8.63k £7.37k
Total expenditure £6.34k £3.32k £8.54k £2.69k £27.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 17 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 10 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 07 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Deborah Simpson, VRSA
Villa Real School
Villa Real Road
Consett
Co Durham
DH8 6BH
Phone:
07527976747