COTSWOLD OWL RESCUE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity offers help and advise about owl habitat, welfare and rehabilitation. The charity educates the wider community on rehabilitation. We do not have a sanctuary, but recovery avaries at home prior to the re-release of wild owls. We are always available to give advise on the phones. We continue to work with 'Cotswold Falconry Centre'
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 09 April 1997: Standard registration
- 01 April 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- TWO HOOTS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £999 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.52k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 17 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 23 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 10 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5 FEBRUARY 1997, DEEDS OF VARIANCE DATED 13 JULY 1998 AND 9 NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF AND PROTECTION OF SICK AND INJURED NATIVE BRITISH OWLS BY THE MAINTENANCE AND PROVISION OD SUCH FACILITIES AND ASSISTANCE FOR THEIR TREATMENT AND TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN OWL HUSBANDRY, CONSERVATION AND PRESERVATION
Area of benefit
GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND OXFORDSHIRE WITH A PREFERENCE FOR COTSWOLD DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window