Accounts and annual returns ST. GEORGE'S INTERNATIONAL SCHOOL OF MEDICINE, GRENADA

Charity number: 1061664
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2014 30 April 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2014 30 April 2015 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2013 29 April 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2013 29 April 2014 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2012 29 April 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2012 29 April 2013 On Time