EAST ANGLIAN BRASS BAND ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Each year a Spring Festival is held. This is either a contest in which bands perform a short concert, or a solo & quartet contest, or a sectional workshop and an evening concert performed by one of the top brass bands in the country. The Charity also holds an annual training day for brass players of all ages & abilities. The tutors are players/conductors from the top brass bands in the country.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cambridgeshire
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 09 June 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
YVONNE OWERS | Chair | 12 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Carole Jean Carman | Trustee | 18 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Mark Wilson | Trustee | 03 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Anne Kemp | Trustee | 03 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JANE BUSSEY | Trustee | 12 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
LINSAY LAVER | Trustee | 12 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET WHILEY | Trustee | 31 March 2012 |
|
|||||
CHRISTINE DIANNE WADE | Trustee |
|
||||||
STEPHEN WADE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.88k | £8.42k | £6.44k | £14.86k | £5.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.25k | £7.81k | £8.82k | £10.98k | £10.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £450 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4TH MAY 1997 AS AMENDED 6TH NOVEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND DEVELOP PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND FESTIVALS AND TO CO-ORDINATE TRAINING OF INDIVIDUAL BAND MEMBERS BY PRESENTING MASTERCLASSES COURSES AND OTHER TUTORIALS.
Area of benefit
SUFFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 RYDAL CLOSE
STOWMARKET
IP14 1QX
- Phone:
- 01449672600
- Email:
- administration@eabba.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window