ISUOG COURSES AND CONFERENCES LIMITED

Charity number: 1063743
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

ISUOG Courses and Conferences Limited is established for the protection and preservation of health by promoting education in obstetrics and gynaecology for the benefit of the public. The company's primary activity in achieving this aim is providing education in obstetrics and gynaecology.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 August 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ISUOG CCL (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Prof. Asma Khalil Trustee 07 February 2024
THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY OF ULTRASOUND IN OBSTETRICS AND GYNECOLOGY
Received: 36 days late
GEFOG HEALTH FOUNDATION
Recently registered
Prof. Laurent Julien Salomon Trustee 02 February 2024
None on record
Prof. Reem Sameer Abu-Rustum Trustee 02 February 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £2.17m £46.79k £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £2.54m £11.78k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £520 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £23.72k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £2.11m N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £37.99k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £2.54m N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £202.53k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 06 December 2024 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 06 December 2024 402 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 25 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
I S U O G
122 Freston Road
London
W10 6TR
Phone:
02074719955