CROYLAND NURSERY SCHOOL FUNDRAISING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing education and services to the less advantaged people of the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 06 June 1997: Standard registration
- CROYLAND COUNTY NURSERY SCHOOL FUNDRAISING (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Whitney | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Cath Draper | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.01k | £17 | £0 | £0 | £3.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.17k | £766 | £0 | £0 | £7.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 February 2025 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2025 | 357 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 March 2023 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 February 2022 | 372 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JANUARY 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN CROYLAND COUNTY SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
WELLINGBOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
CROYLAND NURSERY SCHOOL
CROYLAND ROAD
WELLINGBOROUGH
NN8 2AX
- Phone:
- 01933279681
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window