Financial history LET'S LINK

Charity Number: 1075215
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £263.23k £159.40k £218.53k £220.44k £183.78k
Total expenditure £244.50k £134.36k £198.06k £213.72k £191.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £72.00k £72.00k £0
Income from government grants £45.00k £50.73k N/A N/A £74.00k