BARTLEY VILLAGE HALL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1062422
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The provision and maintenance of a community hall for the use of the habitants of Bartley in the Parish of Netley Marsh in Hampshire and the neighbourhood.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £13,936
Total expenditure: £19,350

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 May 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kim Thomas Trustee 22 May 2023
None on record
Sandra Robertson Trustee 17 June 2020
THE HOUSE OF THE BLESSED MARY THE VIRGIN IN OXFORD, COMMONLY CALLED ORIEL COLLEGE, OF THE FOUNDATION OF EDWARD THE SECOND OF FAMOUS MEMORY SOMETIME KING OF ENGLAND
Received: On time
ROYAL COMMISSION FOR THE EXHIBITION OF 1851
Received: On time
Gillian Howard Trustee 04 August 2019
None on record
Heidi Underhill Trustee 25 April 2016
None on record
Rosie Zollo Trustee 20 April 2015
None on record
Bridget Babey Trustee 24 November 2014
None on record
Diane Elizabeth Williams Trustee 08 September 2014
None on record
Colleen Dane Trustee 22 April 2014
None on record
Mark John Littleton-Gray Trustee 12 March 2008
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.57k £11.63k £18.24k £13.94k £13.94k
Total expenditure £8.00k £8.03k £10.00k £19.35k £19.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.33k £10.10k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 May 2024 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Bartley Village Hall
Shepherds Road
Bartley
Southampton
SO40 2LH
Phone:
07786157089
Website:

No information available