PIERRE FOURNIER AWARD

Charity Number: 1062846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Aim to further the solo careers of exceptionally talented young cellists

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £1,747
Total expenditure: £10,655

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 June 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RAPHAEL WALLFISCH Chair 23 June 2022
THE MURIEL TAYLOR SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time
Jo Cole Trustee 30 May 2022
THE TILLETT TRUST
Received: 1 day late
Thomas David Benedict Woods Trustee 30 May 2022
None on record
Matthew Huber Trustee 06 May 2022
None on record
Justin Nicholas Pearson Trustee 24 November 2018
None on record
Hannah Catherine Roberts Trustee 24 November 2018
None on record
GUY JOHNSTON Trustee 29 March 2014
None on record
ALICE NEARY Trustee
None on record
RALPH KIRSHBAUM Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £157 £12 £1 £600 £1.75k
Total expenditure £2.09k £5.24k £0 £2.84k £10.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 November 2020 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
6 Penland Road
BEXHILL-ON-SEA
East Sussex
TN40 2JG
Phone:
020726244732