Financial history Transformed International Ltd

Charity number: 1062561
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £164.22k £100.65k £112.95k £91.84k £83.75k
Total expenditure £195.02k £115.63k £119.28k £84.72k £92.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A