Financial history BRIGHTON HOVE AND WEST SUSSEX DEAF CHILDREN'S SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1061540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £2.80k £1.36k £4.26k £5.61k £6.11k
Total expenditure £4.80k £1.77k £6.58k £8.56k £7.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A