Accounts and annual returns HARMANS WATER WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1061563
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 11 August 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 26 September 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 30 March 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2004 18 May 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not Required