THE MUSEUM OF NET MANUFACTURE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Documents and artefacts concerned with the rope and net manufacturing business in Bridport and surrounding districts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
Governance
- 03 June 1998: Standard registration
- 24 April 2015: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 24 April 2015: Funds transferred to 1090327 THE MUSEUM BRIDPORT DORSET
- BRIDPORT MUSEUM OF NET MANUFACTURERS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2009 | 30/04/2010 | 30/04/2011 | 30/04/2012 | 30/04/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.83k | £854 | £663 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2013 | 27 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2012 | 20 February 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2011 | 19 December 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 JANUARY 1998.
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE AND DISSEMINATE KNOWLEDGE OF HISTORY AND METHODS OF NET MANUFACTURE. B) TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE COLLECTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE NATION AT LARGE. C) TO FOUND, KEEP UP AND MAINTAIN A MUSEUM FOR THE DISPLAY OF THE COLLECTION TO THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window