THE HORTON LODGE SCHOOL PARENT STAFF AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Parent Staff & Friends Association is run predominantly by parents and is supported by staff and friends of the school. The PSFA organise fundraising events throughout the year, including an Annual School Fun Day, live music events, school discos, etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 20 October 1997: Standard registration
- HORTON LODGE PSFA (Working name)
- HORTON LODGE SCHOOL PSFA (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Hough | Chair | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL BEDFORD | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.01k | £3.85k | £6.95k | £15.17k | £9.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.90k | £9.32k | £11.48k | £3.68k | £7.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 02 August 2024 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 19 June 2022 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 16 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 JUNE 1997 AS AMENDED 25 SEPTEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Parent Staff & Friends Association
Horton Lodge Community Special Scho
RUDYARD
LEEK
ST13 8RB
- Phone:
- 07952758238
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window