Financial history ALANBROOKE NURSERY

Charity number: 1062234
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £125.14k £100.27k £92.74k £122.54k £100.36k
Total expenditure £115.93k £93.87k £90.77k £110.50k £95.21k
Income from government contracts £48.10k N/A N/A £28.23k £26.90k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £36.33k N/A N/A