Financial history HARMSTON MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 1062434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £23.79k £19.31k £7.09k £18.30k £25.39k
Total expenditure £20.87k £14.42k £11.19k £20.54k £24.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A