RUSSELL FOSTER TYNE AND WEAR SPORTS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of football fields and open space for recreational use for under 12's, together with associated facilities for both boys and girls.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Sunderland
Governance
- 24 July 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES RUSSELL FOSTER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL CLARK | Trustee | 16 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE TILLEY | Trustee | 16 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID N ARMSTRONG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.00k | £5.00k | £5.00k | £10.00k | £10.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.53k | £50.03k | £5.31k | £9.63k | £4.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 November 2020 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 MARCH 1997
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF EIGHTEEN YEARS BY THE PROVISION OF FOOTBALLING FACILITIES AND THE FURTHERANCE OF TRAINING IN THE SPORT OF FOOTBALL AND OTHER ALLIED SPORTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Durham Estates Ltd
Temple Chambers
Douro Terrace
Sunderland
SR2 7DX
- Phone:
- 01915651122
- Email:
- mick.clark@rfyl.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window