THE MUSKETEERS MARCHING CARNIVAL DISPLAY BAND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 20 October 1997: Standard registration
- 19 January 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 19 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 09 September 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED AS AMENDED 2 AUGUST 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE MUSICAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN RESIDING WITHIN THE NEIGHBOURHOOD OF SCARBOROUGH BY HELPING TO TRAIN THEM IN PLAYING OF MARCHING BAND INSTRUMENTS AND BY MEANS OF CONCERTS AND EXHIBITIONS AT WHICH SUCH CHILDREN MAY PERFORM AS A BAND TO ADVANCE THE AESTHETIC EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
THE NEIGHBOURHOOD OF SCARBOROUGH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window