CHRYSALIS (MANCHESTER)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Accredited Cultural Parenting skills training which has continued to help BAME parents to improve their parenting skills.Provide parent advocacy to Social Services, Family courts. Registered as a UK online centre to deliver computer training. Deliver ESOL; Sewing; and Talk English classes; and a successful Foodbank. Raise awareness on Human Trafficking; domestic violence; culture and relationships
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £17,000 from 2 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
Governance
- 27 October 1997: Standard registration
- 03 July 2015: Funds received from 1112586 CARISMA (COMMUNITY ALLIANCE FOR RENEWAL, INNER SOU...
- CHRYSALIS MANCHESTER (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Homes England
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Florence Okolo | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jameel Hadi | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Asgill | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Papa Andoh Kweku | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Neyu | Trustee | 29 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
BERNARD LEACH | Trustee | 18 January 2013 |
|
|||||
CHRISTINE MILLINYU | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.01k | £20.31k | £10.36k | £30.45k | £17.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.69k | £24.59k | £7.51k | £27.05k | £27.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £17.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.87k | £12.91k | £6.16k | £13.33k | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 JUNE 1993 AS AMENDED ON 14 DECEMBER 1994 AND 25 APRIL 1997
Charitable objects
THE CENTRE IS ESTABLISHED TO PROVIDE BENEFITS FOR THE INHABITANTS OF MOSS SIDE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATION, AND THE LOCAL INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE MOSS SIDE, MANCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Westerling Way
Manchester
M16 7EA
- Phone:
- 01612268090
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window