ST MICHAEL ASSOCIATES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Michael Associates' principal objectives continue to be the promotion and advancement of education of public in general. Our services include learning and behavioural support programmes, outreach support to hard-to-reach communities, social and health well-being of families living with autism and are at risk of mental health difficulties and young people enrichment opportunities programmes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 30 May 1997: Standard registration
- 12 May 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 28/02/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £157.77k | £148.26k | £174.75k | £165.00k | £164.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £151.83k | £152.12k | £173.34k | £164.85k | £167.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 27 February 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 27 February 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2020 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2020 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 02 June 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 02 June 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ADOPTED 24 AUGUST 1995 ( AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON I MAY 1997)
Charitable objects
"TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL IN THEIR UNDERSTANDING OF ALL ASPECTS OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN SCHOOLS, COLLEGES AND ALL OTHER LEVELS OF THE EDUCATION SYSTEM IN GENERAL AND IN CONFERENCES AND DEBATES OPEN TO THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window