Accounts and annual returns THE ESSEX SOCIETY HOLIDAY BUNGALOW FUND

Charity number: 1068275
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 26 August 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 25 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 24 July 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 12 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required