Trustees THE KALISHER TRUST
Charity number: 1062363

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN DUNSTON | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Brady KC | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
RABAH KHERBANE | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Garry Green | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
DANIELLE JENETTE MANSON | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
MERRY ANNE VAN WOODENBERG | Trustee | 10 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
The Reverend Doctor Sir Ralph Waller, KBE | Trustee | 13 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Fenhalls QC | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
MAXIMILIAN HARDY | Trustee | 15 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Edmund Vickers QC | Trustee | 15 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Henrietta Paget KC | Trustee | 01 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
THE RIGHT HONOURABLE LADY JUSTICE RAFFERTY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.