BERMUDA AND STOCKINGFORD INTENSIVE CARE SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds to buy, often life saving, equipment for the relief and assistance of coronary care patients of the George Eliot Hospital, Nuneaton.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2019
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 16 July 1997: Standard registration
- B. A. S. I. C. S. (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER JOHN TURNER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JOHN WOODS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EMMA JAYNE SMITH-WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THOMAS HAYDN WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOYA JOSEPHINE WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2015 | 28/02/2016 | 28/02/2017 | 28/02/2018 | 28/02/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.49k | £14.31k | £14.63k | £13.64k | £10.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.14k | £4.41k | £19.09k | £4.19k | £3.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 142 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 142 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 509 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 509 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 874 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 874 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1239 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1239 days | |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1603 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1603 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 JUNE 1997
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CORONARY CONDITIONS, IN PARTICULAR FOR PATIENTS IN THE CORONARY CARE UNIT OF GEORGE ELIOT HOSPITAL NUNEATON, BY THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT AND MACHINES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL HEALTH AUTHORITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ORCHARDS END
71 ORCHARD STREET
BEDWORTH
CV12 8BN
- Phone:
- 02476317280
- Email:
- moya.walker@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window