Financial history BARLOW PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1064990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £101.60k £103.59k £119.95k £122.77k £164.79k
Total expenditure £97.76k £108.94k £112.35k £121.24k £135.73k
Income from government contracts £80.01k £83.03k £94.79k £83.11k £111.44k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A