DORSET ISLAMIC CULTURAL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Usage of premises for worship and Islamic education for the children. The Centre acts as a community centre and wellbeing for the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 19 July 1997: Standard registration
- DORSET ISLAMIC CULTRAL ORGANISATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Azad Miah | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL HANNAN CHOUDHURY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GHULAM MUSTAFA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ABDUL MALIK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.05k | £7.93k | £20.06k | £38.03k | £60.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.78k | £36.62k | £29.30k | £58.98k | £68.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 May 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
24 June 2024 | 145 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 May 2024 | 472 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 May 2024 | 837 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 May 2024 | 1202 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
24 June 2024 | 1240 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 JUNE 1997
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE MUSLIM RELIGION IN POOLE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS INCLUDING WIMBORNE MINISTER AND WEYMOUTH BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE CHARITABLE AT LAW
Area of benefit
POOLE AND SURROUNDING AREAS INCL WIMBORNE MINSTER AND WEYMOUTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 EMERSON ROAD
POOLE
BH15 1QT
- Phone:
- 01202681498
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window