MICHAEL AND SHIRLEY HUNT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Primarily to relieve the hardship faced by prisoners and the families of prisoners and relieving the suffering of animals. Other charitable purposes at the trustees discretion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 12 July 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEBORAH SUSAN JENKINS | Trustee |
|
||||||
WANDA JANE BAKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHESTER JOHN HUNT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATHY DORIS MAYBERRY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £242.61k | £231.53k | £237.41k | £305.07k | £378.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.33k | £77.78k | £89.93k | £112.72k | £112.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 JUNE 1997
Charitable objects
(SUMMARY OF PRIMARY OBJECTS) 1. TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS PERSONS WHO ARE CHARGED WITH CRIMINAL OFFENCES OR THEIR SPOUSES, WIDOWS, WIDOWERS OR DEPENDANTS (EXCLUDING THAT CAUSED BY THE IMPOSITION OF FINES ETC). 2. TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS THAT ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OR MAINTENANCE OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION AND CARE OF UNWANTED ANIMALS OR THE TREATMENT OR SICK OR ILL-TREATED ANIMALS. SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE TRUST DEED FOR FULL DETAILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ANSTY HOUSE
HENFIELD ROAD
SMALL DOLE
HENFIELD
WEST SUSSEX
BN5 9XH
- Phone:
- 01903817116
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window