THE HABERDASHERS' MILLENNIUM TREASURES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Acquires, maintains, displays for public access items reflecting the contribution of the Haberdashers' Livery Company to the development of the life of the City of London
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of London
Governance
- 22 April 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Mark Archer | Trustee | 13 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Davis | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sheridan Swallow | Trustee | 06 December 2016 |
|
|||||
James Kininmonth | Trustee | 06 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.49k | £2.33k | £42.91k | £3.69k | £2.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.51k | £1.95k | £27.82k | £5.22k | £2.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 05 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 11 MARCH 1997
Charitable objects
TO ACQUIRE, PRESERVE, MAINTAIN AND DISPLAY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC WORKS OF ART, ARTEFACTS, DOCUMENTS, PICTURES, CARVINGS, SCULPTURES AND SUCH LIKE MATERIAL WHICH REFLECTS THE HISTORIC CONTRIBUTION TO AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE LIFE OF THE CITY OF LONDON BY THE HABERDASHERS COMPANY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CLERK
HABERDASHERS' HALL
18 WEST SMITHFIELD
LONDON
EC1A 9HQ
- Phone:
- 02072469988
- Email:
- enquiries@haberdashers.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window